Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Nix, Leroy Iii, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMENZ, NICOLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COLLECTIONS - FINES AND COSTS DUE IN 30 DAYS - UNABLE TO FORWARD | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ISSUED $496.50 - Recorded (OR.3317.2162. / 3120200039288) | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.3317.2163. / 3120200039289) | |
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event | LATE NOTICE COLLECTION LETTER (COVID-19) | |
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE UPDATED : FINES AND/OR COURT COSTS REQUIRED BY: 04/23/2020 | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT & SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.3285.2036. / 3120200015983) | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | CHARGE CNT 2 SENTENCING NOTES: PG; ADJ/G; 30 DAYS CJ CTS CONC; $218 CRT COSTS; $25 COI; $100 COP; $53.50 PD APP; PAY OR ENTER PMT PLAN WITHIN 72 HOURS OF RELEASE. PD DIAZ PRESENT WITH DEFENDANT. | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : FINES AND/OR COURT COSTS REQUIRED BY: 03/13/2020 | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | ADJUDICATED GUILTY SEQ: 1 | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF GUILTY SEQ 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.