Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Thornton Trustee, Laura L filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with LINN, MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2020 |
CategoryNotice Of Trust |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO JACOBS, MELINDA M RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312020CP000049XXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: NOT-1/14/2020 | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $41.00 RECEIPT #2020001910 | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 01/14/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CP 000049 | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: JACOBS, MELINDA M ASSIGNED | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TRUST | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.