Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Harmon, Christina G, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MORGAN, DAVID C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims $501 - $2500 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR SERVICE OF 60 DAYS ORDER PROVIDING FOR AUTOMATIC DISMISSAL IF SERVICE IS NOT ACHIEVED - Recorded (OR.3353.1888. / 3120200066364) | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PROCESS ON DEFENDANT AND SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE | |
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTIONS SET FOR 08/20/2020 AT 2:30 PM IN 2/ , JDG: MORGAN, DAVID C | |
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION, NOTICE AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS STATUS CHANGED TO NOT FOUND | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | VERIFIED RETURN OF NON-SERVICE (CHRISTINA G HARMON) | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2020000257 | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED: CHRISTINA G HARMON | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.