Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Gribble, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MORGAN, DAVID C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims $501 - $2500 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTIONS SET FOR 09/17/2020 AT 2:30 PM IN 2/ , JDG: MORGAN, DAVID C | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION, NOTICE AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.3339.885. / 3120200055282) | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ***PTC PLF-P DEF-NP ATTY TO PREPARE DFJ**** | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ( ROBERT GRIBBLE SVD: 1/14/2020) | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2020000258 | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: ROSEN, JOSEPH F ASSIGNED | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.