Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Skinner, Cedar Allen, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2019 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
INFORMATION FILED (ORIGINAL)
Date: August 07, 2019SURETY BOND 562251504-7 POSTED $1,000.00
Date: August 02, 2019ARREST AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION | |
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312019MM001486AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: EFAFFVIOLPR-5/19/2020 | |
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT TO REINSTATE DRIVER LICENSE/PRIVILEGE MAILED TO DEFENDANT | |
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTES- ADVISED CUSTOMER TO MAKE PAYMENT USING GENERAL PAYMENTS OPTION ( $446.50 ) DEF'S MOM CALLED | |
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $446.50 RECEIPT #2020013502 | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | DEF DEFAULTED ON PAYMENT PLAN-MUST PAY IN FULL | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION ISSUED 01/23/2020 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - FAILED TO PAY $446.50 | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF PROBATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.