Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Edith G Hulton, Unknown, Florida Housing Finance Corporation, Hulton, Edith G, Possession Of The Subject Prop, Unknown, Wood Duck Island Property Owners Association Inc, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with CROOM, JANET C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryHomest Res Forecl $250000 Or More |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE
Date: December 31, 2019VALUE OF PROPERTY OR MTG FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: December 31, 2019DEFENDANT WOOD DUCK PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.'S MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 20, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 22, 2021NOTICE OF FILING (CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL PLAN)
Date: March 15, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 06, 2020FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: March 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR.3403.1606. / 3120210021448) | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING (CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL PLAN) | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 02/23/2021 AT 8:30 PM IN 7/ , JDG: CROOM, JANET C | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT WOOD DUCK PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.'S MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ***SUSPENSE CK FOR $140.00 PAYABLE TO CHOICE LEGAL GROUP P.A. M/ATTY 3/2/2020*** | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | ***SUSPENSE CK REQUEST FOR $140.00 PAYABLE TO CHOICE LEGAL GROUP P.A. SENT TO IH*** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.