Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Roth, Bradley Alan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gillin, Eric S, against Burnett, Deborah, represented by Shelton, Adam, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with CROOM, JANET C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 29, 2019COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: July 29, 2019NON-PARTY, PIRTEK USA LLC'S RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION
Date: December 02, 2019DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: December 02, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 02, 2020AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES (FOR DEBORAH BURNETT)
Date: February 18, 2020PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR MEDIATION
Date: November 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT DEBORAH BURNETT'S COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFF BRADLEY ALAN ROTH'S REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT CIVIL JURY/NON-JURY DIVISION AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER (STANDARD TRACK) | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SUBMIT AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.