Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Shirey, Richard O, filed a(n) Other case represented by Johnson, Aaron V, against Browne Shirey, Stacie, Browne, Stacie, represented by Rollin, Kevin M, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with CROOM, JANET C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCROOM, JANET C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2019 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
|
VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: April 01, 2019PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019011933
Date: April 02, 2019ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION - Recorded (OR.3363.1009. / 3120200073151)
Date: November 30, 2020NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING
Date: January 08, 2021ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION - Recorded (OR.3361.376. / 3120200071679)
Date: November 19, 2020PLAINTIFF'S FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT *SAME PARTIES*
Date: August 12, 2020MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: September 24, 2020MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (STACIE BROWN SHIREY)
Date: July 27, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: March 28, 2019SUMMONS
Date: March 28, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED: STACIE BROWNE
Date: April 10, 2019MOTION TO DISMISS (DEFENDANT STACIE BROWNE)
Date: June 03, 2019MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT **PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (SAME PARTIES)**
Date: September 10, 2019MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: September 12, 2019AMENDED MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: November 06, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: November 13, 2019MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: November 13, 2019SECOND AMENDED MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: November 13, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (STACIE BROWNE - SVD: 5/4/19)
Date: November 14, 2019ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Date: December 16, 2019ORDER ON SECOND AMENDED MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: December 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT - Recorded (OR.3416.1465. / 3120210030947) | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO DISMISS | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR THE COURT TO TAKE MANDATORY JUDICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 90.202, 90.23 | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION - Recorded (OR.3363.1009. / 3120200073151) | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION - Recorded (OR.3361.376. / 3120200071679) | |
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN COUNTS I, II, III, AND V; AND DISMISSING COUNT IV WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.3337.775. / 3120200053739) | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.