Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case against Payton, Marcello Demond, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with WILD, JOE A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILD, JOE A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 03, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | PAY FINE SEQ: 1 | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $72.00 RECEIPT #2018027554 | |
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 30 DAYS TO COMPLY WITH FISHING/HUNTING VIOLATION REQUIRED BY: 07/20/2018 | |
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED SEQ: 1 - (379.354(139)**) RECREATIONAL LICENSES PERMITS AND AUTHORIZATION | |
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 07/03/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 IN 001320 A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.