Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kemp, Ronald, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kemp, Marsha A, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with PEGG, ROBERT L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | STATE OF FLORIDA VITAL STATISTICS | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.3100.1678. / 3120180016092) | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | * * * * * DEFAULT ISSD * * * * * | |
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED | |
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $12.00 RECEIPT #2018001286 | |
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.