Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Anderson, Mary Stauffer, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MORGAN, DAVID C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMORGAN, DAVID C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - A0X19GE | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - A0X19GE | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - A0X19GE | |
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - A0X19GE | |
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - A0X19GE | |
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $171.00 RECEIPT #2015032918 | |
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.