Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-2, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Valenti, Kristina, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with WILD, JOE A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 14, 2014 |
CategoryDamages $500 But Less Than $2500 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.2865.615. / 3120150045261) | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SVD:8/27/14 (KRISTINA VALENTI) | |
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER DISMISSING CASE AND APPROVING SETTLEMENT - Recorded (OR.2786.2307. / 3120140052815) | |
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND JOINT MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT | |
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event | **WARRANT 368259 AMT OF $10.00 MAILED ATTY** | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | **SUSPENSE CHECK REQUEST AMT OF $10.00 TO KD** | |
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2014036318 | |
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2014036113 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00 | |
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2014036113 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.