Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Scarpinato, Sheryl, Scarpinato, Denis, filed a(n) Construction - Torts case against Roc Maintenance, Inc., represented by Bernal, Roland V, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with COX, CYNTHIA L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2013 |
CategoryNegl-Construction Defect |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeConstruction |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.2741.505. / 3120140011723) | |
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE | |
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDEROF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.2741.506. / 3120140011724) | |
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFFS (DENIS SCARPINATO & SHERYL SCARPINATO) | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVILABILITY | |
November 21, 2013 | Docket Event | NON PARTY FIDELITY FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY'S PRIVILEGE LOG | |
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event | NON-PARTY FIDELITY FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ROC MAINTENANCE INC'S SUBPOENA DT | |
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event | NOON-PARTY FIDELITY & CASUALTY7 COMPANY'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT ROC MAINTENANCE, INC'S SUBPOENA DT | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | NON PARTY FIDELITY FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.