Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Lynn, Michael David, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with WILD, JOE A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILD, JOE A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2006 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2008 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 200802151690015, PAYMENT $785.70 | |
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event | MODIFICATION OF PROBATION DEF TO PAY FINE OF $203.70 IN LIEU | |
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event | OF PERFORMING 30 HRS COMM SERVICE | |
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR & TERMINATION OF PROBATION | |
July 30, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER OF PROBATION | |
July 03, 2007 | Docket Event | CT:2 REPORT W/I 72 HRS OF RELEASE | |
July 03, 2007 | Docket Event | CT:2 ADMIT VOP; ADJ G FOR ORIGINAL OFFENSE, REINSTATE | |
July 03, 2007 | Docket Event | CT:2 PROBATION SAME TERMS, 30 DAYS CJ, CTS, | |
June 25, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR BRADY MATERIAL | |
June 25, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY PD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.