Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case against Gabor, Rosalinda P, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MORGAN, DAVID C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2006 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF COMMUNITY SERVICE FILED | |
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 200704110910034, PAYMENT $75.00 | |
March 20, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER-COM SERVCIE MAY BE DONE AT SUNCOAST SCHOOL | |
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event | FILE TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW | |
March 08, 2007 | Docket Event | SA COUNCIL; DEF MUST PROVIDE PROOF BY 5/11/07 TO CLERK'S OFC; | |
March 08, 2007 | Docket Event | PG; W/H ADJ; JUDGE CONVERTED FINE TO 15 HRS COMM SERV CONC THRU | |
March 08, 2007 | Docket Event | $35 CC + $40 NPP; PAY BY 4/13/07 | |
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event | WITNESS SUBPOENA | |
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event | SET FOR TRIAL WITHOUT JURY 03/08/2007 AT 9:00 | |
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event | DEF CAME IN & SIGNED WPNG; SET FOR INF HEARING 3/8/07 AT 9:00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.