Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Indian River Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Forbus, Sandra S A K A, Fausett, Sandra S, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MORGAN, DAVID C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMORGAN, DAVID C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2006 |
CategoryDelinquent Acct. Under $5000.00 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | ***** FILE DESTROYED ***** | |
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event | DEFAULT FINAL JUDGEMENT /S/DCM 1/17/07 ORBK: 2126 PG: 266 | |
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event | **C: DFJ W/FACT INFO M/DEF W/HOW TO COLLECT TO PLF** | |
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event | *PTC, PLF - P, DFT - NP, DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT | |
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event | W/FACT INFO* | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 200612290910035, PAYMENT $255.00 | |
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event | **C:VIA MAIL** | |
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event | RTN: 12/28/06 SVD: 12/28/06 | |
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event | SUMS' ISSD' (SANDRA S FORBUS A/K/A) PS: BRESSETT | |
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.