Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Scavone, Sandra M, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with WILD, JOE A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILD, JOE A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2006 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 200803111690022, PAYMENT $359.00 | |
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event | PROBATION ORDER ISSUED | |
October 31, 2007 | Docket Event | CT:2 ADMITS VOP - PROB REINSTATED - 40 DAYS CJ CTS | |
October 31, 2007 | Docket Event | CT:2 REPORT TO PROB W/IN 72 HRS OF RELEASE FROM JAIL | |
October 30, 2007 | Docket Event | JUDGE WILD | |
October 30, 2007 | Docket Event | SET FOR SENTENCING ON 10/31/2007 AT 8:30 | |
October 30, 2007 | Docket Event | VOP WARRANT SERVED 10/30/2007 | |
October 30, 2007 | Docket Event | VOP WRNT SRVD; ARR AFF; 1ST APP; ADMIT; SENT 10/31/2007 BEFORE | |
October 23, 2007 | Docket Event | VOP; NO BOND | |
October 23, 2007 | Docket Event | VOP WARRANT ISSUED 10/23/2007 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.