Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Pommerening, Joshua L, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with WILD, JOE A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILD, JOE A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2006 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $142.00 RECEIPT #2016011927 | |
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PARTIAL PAYMENT RECEIVED FROM PIONEER CREDIT RECOVERY $142.00 | |
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event | AMOUNT DUE NOW W/40%: $1,006.60 | |
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event | SENT TO COLLECTIONS | |
December 07, 2007 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
November 20, 2007 | Docket Event | CT:3 ADMIT VOP; ADJ G, REVOKE & TERM PROBATION, | |
November 20, 2007 | Docket Event | CT:3 60 DAYS CJ, CTS, 2 YR D/L SUSP. | |
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event | VOP WRNT SRVD; ARR AFF; 1ST APP | |
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event | SET FOR ARRAIGNMENT 11/20/2007 AT 8:30 | |
October 11, 2007 | Docket Event | VOP WARRANT SERVED 10/11/2007 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.