Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Blanco, Jesus Perez, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MORGAN, DAVID C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2006 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2007 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROSEQUI | |
April 09, 2007 | Docket Event | SET FOR TRIAL 04/12/2007 AT 9:00 | |
April 04, 2007 | Docket Event | CT:1 MOTION TO SUPPRESS CONTINUED TO 4/09/07 AT 130 | |
April 04, 2007 | Docket Event | CT:1 STATE TO CALL OFFICER & VICTIM | |
April 04, 2007 | Docket Event | CT:1 SET FOR TRIAL | |
April 04, 2007 | Docket Event | SET FOR DOCKET CALL 04/09/2007 AT 8:30 | |
April 04, 2007 | Docket Event | CT:1 MOTION TO SUPPRESS CONTINUED TO 4/9/07 AT 130 | |
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF APPEARANCE PURSUANT TO FLA R CRIM | |
March 30, 2007 | Docket Event | DEF'S SECOND (3RD)DISCOVERY EXHIBIT WITH NOTICE OF INTENT TO | |
March 30, 2007 | Docket Event | RELY UPON ALIBI DEFENSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.