Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Faison, Latresa D, Bristol, Tawana, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Hinton, Erman Eugene Jr, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with PEGG, ROBERT L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePEGG, ROBERT L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryDor Paternity/Disestablishment Of Paternity |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF IIV-D SERVICES | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | EX-PARTE MOTION /ORDER AMENDING ORDER OF DECEMBER 15,2016 - Recorded (OR.2996.2339. / 3120170004361) | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | RECOMMENDATION FINAL ORDER ON MOTION TO REDIRECT SUPPORT - Recorded (OR.2991.1017. / 3120160073657) | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | INCOME WITHHOLDING ORDER / FLORIDA ADDENDUM TO IWO | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | CSE PAYMENT HISTORY | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION TO REDIRECT SUPPORT | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.3002.1751. / 3120170009189) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.