Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ward, Tami L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ward, Ronald, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with COX, CYNTHIA L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event | ***** FILE DESTROYED ***** | |
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS DESTROYED. | |
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT/CERTIFICATE OF DELINQUENCY | |
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event | ORBK: 2502 PG: 1337 (1 PAGE) | |
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF IV-D SERVICES EFF: | |
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT DISPOSAL LETTERS SENT TO ATTYS LEFFEW AND MC HUGH | |
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event | ORBK: 2500 PG: 1597-1598 (2) PAGES | |
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER ON STIPULATION TO TERMINATE CHILD SUPPORT /S/ J PBK | |
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event | (+)SENT A COPY TO DOR & REYMORE ON 5/25/11 (MM) | |
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event | FORMER HUSBAND'S AFFIDAVIT OF NO ARREARAGES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.