Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Dean, Stevon S, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MORGAN, DAVID C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2006 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2006 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 200611151560027, PAYMENT $416.50 | |
November 15, 2006 | Docket Event | PNC;ADJG 150 FINE;217.50 CC;25 COI;24 COP; PAY BY 12/15/06 | |
November 05, 2006 | Docket Event | 322.03 5 D/L EXPIRED MORE THAN (4) MONTHS | |
October 24, 2006 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI;DEMAND FOR RECIP DISCOVER CT 01 | |
October 24, 2006 | Docket Event | STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT CT 01 | |
September 29, 2006 | Docket Event | SENT NTA FOR 11/15/2006 CT 01 | |
September 28, 2006 | Docket Event | APP;WPNG BY DELL,KELLY;SET JT FOR 11/15/2006 @130 CT 01 | |
September 28, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY CT 01 | |
September 25, 2006 | Docket Event | STATES OFFER, 100+215+25+24 CT 01 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.