Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Lynn, Michael David, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with VAUGHN, DAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVAUGHN, DAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2006 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE HAS BEEN TRANSFERRED TO 2007MM000078AXXXXX | |
January 05, 2007 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT ON 01/19/2007 HAS BEEN RESET/CANCELLED | |
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event | NO INFORMATION CT 1 | |
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event | INFORMATION CT 2, TRANSFERRED TO COUNTY COURT | |
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event | CT. 001 BONDER: BARNETT BAIL BONDS | |
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event | CT. 002 BONDER: BARNETT BAIL BONDS | |
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event | CT: 002 BOND#: AS1K1707 AMOUNT: $1,000.00 | |
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event | CT: 001 BOND#: AS6K3958 AMOUNT: $5,000.00 | |
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event | SET FOR ARRAIGNMENT 01/19/2007 AT 8:45 | |
December 23, 2006 | Docket Event | ARREST AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.