Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Deliquent Acct. Over $5000.00 case against Clement, Christopher P, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with WILD, JOE A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILD, JOE A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryDeliquent Acct. Over $5000.00 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 16, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | ***** FILE DESTROYED ***** | |
August 20, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING CASE /S/JW 081707 ORBK: 2199 PG: 1591 | |
July 26, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIAL AND ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT | |
July 26, 2007 | Docket Event | CONFERENCE /S/ JW 7/26/07 (CMC:8/16/07 @ 2:30PM) | |
June 25, 2007 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY) | |
June 25, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENTS (AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT & | |
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event | RESPONSE (BY CHRISTOPHER PAUL CLEMENT JR) | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 200612290800025, PAYMENT $255.00 | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | RTN: 01/05/2007 SVD: 01/02/2007 | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | SUMS ISSD (CHRISTOPHER P CLEMENT) SO: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.