Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Providian National Bank, Palisades Collection Llc Assignee Of, filed a(n) Deliquent Acct. Over $5000.00 case against Johnson, Diana A K A, Burklew, Diana, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with WILD, JOE A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2006 |
CategoryDeliquent Acct. Over $5000.00 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | ***** FILE DESTROYED ***** | |
July 28, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ORBK:2062 PG: 1215 | |
July 06, 2006 | Docket Event | MOTION, NOTICE, AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL /S/JW 7/6/06 | |
July 06, 2006 | Docket Event | (HRG: 8/3/06 @ 2:30 PM) | |
July 06, 2006 | Docket Event | ***CASE NOT DISMISSED** | |
February 07, 2006 | Docket Event | SUMS ISSD (DIANA JOHNSON A/K/A DIANA BURKLEW) SO: | |
February 07, 2006 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 200602070690043, PAYMENT $255.00 | |
February 07, 2006 | Docket Event | RTN:2/9/06 SVD:NOT FOUND | |
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.