Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
I R Mall Associates Ltd, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Mckenna, Christine J, against Flamers Corporation, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with HAWLEY, ROBERT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2006 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | ***** FILE DESTROYED ***** | |
February 19, 2007 | Docket Event | CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR DAMAGES /S/RAH-021607 ORBK: 2136 PG: 2374 | |
February 19, 2007 | Docket Event | LETTER TO RAH FROM ATTY MCKENNA DATED 021307 RE:FJ | |
February 01, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON 2/13/07 @ 8:45 AM (MTN OF PLTF | |
February 01, 2007 | Docket Event | DEF. TO RETAIN COUNSEL) | |
February 01, 2007 | Docket Event | TO STRIKE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT AND MTN TO COMPEL | |
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event | MOTION OF PLAINTIFF TO STRIKE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT | |
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event | AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO RETAIN COUNSEL | |
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT (BY JAMES COOK - FLAMERS CORP) | |
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event | SUM'S ISS'D (FLAMERS CORPORATION) PS: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.