Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Davis, Amanda Kay, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against White, Dwayne Fraizer, in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Closed | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER RETURNED MAIL AS TO DWAYNE WHITE | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (SIGNED AND NOTARIZED BY BOTH PARTIES) | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 4/25/2023 at 1115 AM, MX - Judge ERIN BAUR presiding. | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE CASES | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | DRIVER LICENSE AS TO RESPONDENT | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CHECKLIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.