Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Leavins, Benjamin Michael, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Leavins, Leah Peak, in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 23, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Closed | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 1/6/2023 at 0350 PM, MX - Judge RUSSELL ROBERTS presiding. | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: ROBERTS , RUSSELL assigned | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 302022DR000320DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/23/2022 | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Compliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 12/23/2022 | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number CV 12938 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.