Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ward, Sheila, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ward, Hartley, in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON RECOMMENDED ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR CONTEMPT | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Closed | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 6/28/2023 at 0315 PM, MX - Judge ERIN BAUR presiding. | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARIANG BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | FORMER HUSBAND'S ANSWER | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO SHEILA WARD | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CIVIL CONTEMPT/ENFORCEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.