Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Helmes, April N, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Strickland, Cody A, in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 10, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Closed | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CHECKLIST | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCY | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 1/6/2023 at 0345 PM, MX - Judge RUSSELL ROBERTS presiding. | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: ROBERTS , RUSSELL assigned | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 302022DR000305DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/10/2022 | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Compliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 12/10/2022 | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $25.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.