Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Rush, Hailey N, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Closed | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 2/27/2023 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge RUSSELL ROBERTS presiding. | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | RECOMMENDED ORDER ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 1/6/2023 at 0335 PM, MX - Judge RUSSELL ROBERTS presiding. | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | CHECKLIST | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: ROBERTS , RUSSELL assigned | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 302022DR000252DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/7/2022 | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.