Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
St Of Fl Dor, Yates, Malisa, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mcdaniel, John E, against Mayo, Kevin Earl, in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Closed | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Event CHILD SUPPORT scheduled on 10/13/2022 at 0945 AM, MX - Judge JACQUELINE SMITH presiding. | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Reopened for Reopen Civil Contempt Enforcement on 8/26/2022 | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Reopen Civil Contmpt | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTEMPT, NOTICE OF HEARING, NOTICE TO PRODUCE | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.