Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Griggs, Janie M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Brown, David A, in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER RETURNED MAIL AS TO DAVID BROWN | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | RECOMMENDED ORDER ON REGISTERING FOREIGN ORDER | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET DESIGNATION OF CURRENT EMAIL ADDRESS | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Event CHILD SUPPORT scheduled on 8/10/2023 at 0945 AM, MX - Judge JACQUELINE SMITH presiding. | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN ORDER EMAILED TO GLENDA THARP AND JOHN MCDANIEL AT FL DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT DELIVERED 6/12/2023 | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN ORDER - JOHN MCDANIEL SAID TO RESENT TO DAVID BROWN. HE DID NOT RECEVE nOTICE OF REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN ORDER | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RECOMMENDED EX PARTE ORDER ON DENYING MOTION TO CONTEST DRIVER LICENSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.