Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bollon, Jason Sr, St Of Fl Dor, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mcdaniel, John E, against Infinger, Ty, in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | OTHER NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Closed | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND CLERK'S DEFAULT | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO TY ENFINGER | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 302022DR000011DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/13/2022 | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Defense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION W/IN COURT FILING | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO TY INFINGER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.