Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
First Federal Bank, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Church, Kelley Louise, against Brown, Ada C, Brown, Robert E, Dockery, Carolyn C, Dockery, Charles E, Dockery, Jeffrey E, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 17, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 7/7/2023 0315 PM Judge RUSSELL ROBERTS results Cancelled on 8/14/2023 | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Closed | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 8/17/2023 at 0205 PM, MX - Judge RUSSELL ROBERTS presiding. | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED MAY 10 2023 | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO JEB RED JOHNSTON | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO CYNTHIA LYNN MARTINEZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.