Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Brown, Patricia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Brown, Maurice, in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 21, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEETS | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM CHILD SUPPORT REGARDING PAYMENTS | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | TERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEPOSITORY REQUEST TO CREDIT CHILD SUPPORT RECEIPT | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE (PARENTING PLAN AND MARITIAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT INCLUDED) | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO REDIRECT PAYMENTS TO NEW TITLE IV-D CASE | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Closed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.