Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Sundholm, Dennis, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Alley, Megal Elizabeth, represented by Roberts, Russell Sterling, in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY AND RELATED RELIEF | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Closed | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: ROBERTS , RUSSELL Assigned | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION AND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY ORDER | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT B | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PETITIONER/FATHER'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING RESPONDENT/MOTHER'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE AS TO RESPONDENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.