Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Jackson, Christina, St Of Fl Dor, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mcdaniel, John E, against Bartle, Jonathan, in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | FIRST APPEARANCE PAPERWORK AND WRIT OF ATTACHMENT RETURNED SERVED | |
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF CONTEMPT AND WIRT OF ATTACHMENT | |
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Closed | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTEMPT, NOTICE OF HEARING, NOTICE TO PRODUCE | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: ROBERTS , RUSSELL Assigned | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ESTABLISHING PATERNITY AND SUPPORT BOOK: 628 PAGE: 361 | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | INCOME WITHHOLDING ORDER BOOK: 628 PAGE: 338 | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Event CHILD SUPPORT scheduled on 8/12/2021 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge JACQUELINE SMITH presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.