Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Berry, Toni L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Berry, Phillip W Jr, in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 01, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Closed | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 6/7/2021 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge DAVID JOHNSON presiding. | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT SPECIALIST REGARDING HEARING DATES | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK'S DEFAULT | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION RETURNED SERVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.