Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Hazellief, Jacqueline, St Of Fl Dor, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mcdaniel, John E, against Durden, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: ROBERTS , RUSSELL Assigned | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | INCOME WITHHOLDING ORDER BOOK: 623 PAGE: 123 | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | RECOMMENDED ORDER ESTABLISHING PATERNITY AND SUPPORT BOOK: 635 PAGE: 86 | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Closed | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Event CHILD SUPPORT scheduled on 5/6/2021 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge JACQUELINE SMITH presiding. | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEFENDANT | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO MATTHEW DURDEN | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 302021DR000051DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/25/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.