Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Lee, Benjamin O, Lunsford, Tammy A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mutz, Jeremy A., against Hudson, April, in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR RELIEF OF JUDGMENT AND TO VACATE ORDER | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON RECOMMENDED ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD DECEMBER 6, 2023 | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Defense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD OCTOBER 17, 2023, AND NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: ROBERTS , RUSSELL Assigned | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 12/6/2023 at 1045 AM, MX - Judge ERIN BAUR presiding. | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING JEREMY A. MUTZ'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FO RECORD FOR PETITIONER | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER RETURNED MAIL AS TO APRIL HUDSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.