Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Quentin, Hannah, Quentin, Sebastian, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE ON PETITION FOR CHNAGE OF NAME (FAMILY) | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Closed | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME (FAMILY) | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPLEMENTAL FORM FOR PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME (FAMILY) | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 6/7/2021 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge DAVID JOHNSON presiding. | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | BACKGROUND CHECK AS TO SEBASTIAN QUENTIN | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | BACKGROUND CHECK AS TO HANNAH QUENTIN | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CHECKLIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.