Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Kelley, Kalee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kelley, Christopher, represented by Roberts, John Young, in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BOOK: 630 PAGE: 919 | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE BOOK: 629 PAGE: 452 | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Closed | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | OTHER SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE CASES | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.