Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Justice, Lauriel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Roberts, John Young, against Justice, Joshua, represented by Kinner, Toni Renae, Roberts, John Young, in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 9/27/2023 at 1130 AM, MX - Judge TERRY TERRELL presiding. | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $26.00 | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $26.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $26.00 Receipt Number CV 13319 | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ANSWER | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO JOSHUA JUSTICE | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Reopened for Reopen Civil Contempt Enforcement on 6/6/2023 | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Reopen Civil Contmpt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.