Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Landers, Bridgett, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Landers, Jeff, in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE BOOK: 619 PAGE: 246 | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Closed | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON WIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: REGISTER , TIMOTHY assigned | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 302021DR000016DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/15/2021 | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Compliance Default Due 30 Days has been created with due date of 2/14/2021 | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.