Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Harris, Darlene, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with TAYLOR, LUCAS N presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTAYLOR, LUCAS N Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 15, 2021 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedMarch 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Closed | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT AND WAIVER | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING DISCLAIMERS OF INTEREST | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NO FL ESTATE TAX DUE | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DILLIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FOR CREDITORS | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT AND WAIVERS | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO CREDITORS | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Defense Attorney: KRISTI MILLER NOVONGLOSKY Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.