Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Buzbee, Donna, Mcclain, Sandra Lynn, filed a(n) Civil case against Egli, Robert G, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Judge, Not. Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 20, 1987 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC Family Law disposals. Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=TURNERJE Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT DRECA - DOCKET REENTERED CIVIL ACTION. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT DDETL - CASE DETAIL INFORMATION. CONTRACT AMD INDEBTEDNESS DIVISION I. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
August 17, 1987 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT U310 - ORDER ON. AUTHORIZING SETTLEMENT 04/29/1987 JMG. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
August 17, 1987 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT U310 - ORDER ON. DISCHARGING AND RELEASING SETTLEMENT FUNDS 08/14/1987 JMG. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
April 30, 1987 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT U406 - STIP & ORDER OF DISMISSAL. WITH PREJUDICE 04/29/1987 JMG OR 5110 PG 563. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
April 30, 1987 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT U540 - FINAL DISPOSITION FORM. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
April 30, 1987 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT U310 - ORDER ON. AUTHORIZING SETTLEMENT 04/29/1987 JMG OR 5119 PG 540. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
|
April 22, 1987 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT U275 - NOTICE OF HEARING. 04/29/1987 8:45 AM 10 MINUTES. USER ID=BELLAMY Judge: Judge, Not. Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.