Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Brian Drutman, D.C., LLC,Martin, Quanttrill vs GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
On February 28, 2024 a sc personal injury protection-tier 1 $0.00-$99.99 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Costello, Jessica presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 28, 2024
Last Refreshed
March 03, 2024
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
Civil
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
General Differentiated Case Management Order
Date: Feb 29, 2024E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: Feb 29, 2024REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: Feb 28, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Feb 28, 2024NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: Feb 28, 2024REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: Feb 28, 2024REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: Feb 28, 2024E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: Feb 28, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | General Differentiated Case Management Order | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | General Differentiated Case Management Applies | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | File Home Location - Electronic | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM |