Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
UDR Inc vs Findlay, Lauren
On January 31, 2024 a lt residential eviction- possession only case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Allen, Lisa. A presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 31, 2024
Last Refreshed
February 04, 2024
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
Civil
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: Feb 01, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Jan 31, 2024REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: Jan 31, 2024E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: Jan 31, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | File Home Location - Electronic | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |