Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Henriques, Janalie, against Betsy Rothman, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management188 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2010 |
CategoryCollections - Consumer Credit (Crc 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions152 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time347 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT VACATED |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
COURT TRIAL - 1 HR. SHORT CAUSE/ 0 DAY(S) VACATED |
|
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE Not Applicable |
|
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR Not Applicable |
|
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE FILED WITHIN 180 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT VACATED |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (COLLECTIONS) - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY BETSY ROTHMAN Not Applicable |
|
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Not Applicable |
|
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT CANNOT BE ENTERED AT THIS TIME AS TO BETSY ROTHMAN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.